CO HB1334 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a prohibition on disseminating an image of a suicide of a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ban Posting Images Of A Suicide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1334 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.015) (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1334, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1334, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Governor Signed
2019-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-05-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1334
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1334_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1334_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1334_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1334_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1334_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1334_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c8b9fcee0c6a94a7872583ec007b7a0c-hb19-1334-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1334vote59dcec
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1334vote59b31a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1334vote59c46d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e6a03fadda4a8198872583ef00015982-hb19-1334-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1334vote55c6e4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c8b9fcee0c6a94a7872583ec007b7a0c-hb19-1334-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback