CO HB1333 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the taxation of products that contain nicotine, and, in connection therewith, increasing the cigarette tax by eight and seventy-five one-hundredths cents per cigarette and the tobacco products tax by twenty-two percent of the manufacturer's list price; creating a tax on nicotine products that is equal to sixty-two percent of the manufacturer's list price; referring a ballot issue for prior voter approval for the new and increased taxes; dedicating the new tax revenue for behavioral health services for children and youth, health care affordability and accessibility, the Colorado preschool program expansion and enhancement, and the newly created Colorado expanded learning opportunities program; and making an appropriation.
Title
Cigarette Tobacco & Nicotine Products Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.095) (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.090) (Y: 27 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment I) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.040 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.039 (Attachment L) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment H) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.095) (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.090) (Y: 27 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment I) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.040 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.039 (Attachment L) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment H) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1333, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Lost with Amendments - Committee |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
Subjects
Education & School Finance (Pre & K-12)
Fiscal Policy & Taxes
Health Care & Health Insurance
Liquor, Tobacco, & Marijuana
State Revenue & Budget
Fiscal Policy & Taxes
Health Care & Health Insurance
Liquor, Tobacco, & Marijuana
State Revenue & Budget