CO HB1332 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state board of education authorization for an alternative teacher license for a person who participates in an alternative teacher program provided by a designated agency working with a nonpublic early child care facility.
Title
Teachers Nonpublic Child Care & Preschool Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education: This is a conceptual amendment to remove the safety clause and replace it with a petition clause. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1332, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1332 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education: This is a conceptual amendment to remove the safety clause and replace it with a petition clause. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1332, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1332 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2017-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-19 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |