CO HB1332 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Inc Tax Credit For Distributed Energy Resource Sys

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inc Tax Credit For Distributed Energy Resource Sys

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1332 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1332 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1332 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1332 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1332, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
2015-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-05-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2015-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-22HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
2015-04-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/84214F56DAB0B72E87257DF70075710B?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/84214F56DAB0B72E87257DF70075710B/$FILE/1332_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/84214F56DAB0B72E87257DF70075710B/$FILE/1332te_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/84214F56DAB0B72E87257DF70075710B/$FILE/1332fin.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/84214F56DAB0B72E87257DF70075710B/$FILE/1332_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/84214F56DAB0B72E87257DF70075710B/$FILE/1332_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/212C201999FC9D4087257E290064A122
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9439CFDB5FC4FD7787257E2F0081AB4F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9439CFDB5FC4FD7787257E2F0081AB4F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/212C201999FC9D4087257E290064A122
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E0644F7B58DDB4F187257E2F00811CE9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F85F1450B4A2857087257E290064888C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9A778FF3F84B3A2487257E37005E6DCE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/292FDCD9DA22387387257E3C004ADFA7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/829332D1C28E969587257E3C006EFF3E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0CE75487A5EFBE1C87257E3C006F120C

Bill Comments

feedback