CO HB1331 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protecting Colorado citizens who are engaged in an act that is protected by the Colorado constitution from outside agencies.
Title
Protect Colorado Constitutional Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B), severed section A (lines 1-3). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 17-1331 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 17-1331 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 17-1331 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 17-1331 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1331, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |