CO HB1330 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a supplemental state payment relating to certain office-administered oncology-related drugs for qualified providers under the medical assistance program who experienced a reduction in reimbursement payments in the 2017-18 state fiscal year as a result of the implementation of the federal final rules for covered outpatient drugs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Supplemental Payment Office-administered Drugs Medicaid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1330 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1330 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1330 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1330 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1330 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1330 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |