CO HB1330 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning disallowing the use of certain convictions for the purpose of adjudicating a person an habitual criminal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No Escape Convictions For Habitual Criminals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1330 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1330, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06 Governor Signed
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-05-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-04-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2017-04-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-04-18HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-04-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1330
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1330_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1330_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1330_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1330_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1330_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1330_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-18t111412z-hb17-1330-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1036
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hjud2017a2017-04-18t111412z-hb17-1330-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sjud2017a2017-05-01t133640z-hb17-1330-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#1066

Bill Comments

feedback