CO HB1329 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a supplemental state payment to qualified providers of durable medical equipment who experienced a decrease in reimbursement in the 2017-18 state fiscal year as a result of the implementation of the federal "21st Century Cures Act", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Supplemental Payment Durable Medical Equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - CC_HB18-1329_2018A: Adopt first report of first conference committee. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1329 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1329 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1329 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - CC_HB18-1329_2018A: Adopt first report of first conference committee. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1329 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1329 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1329 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-12 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2018-04-11 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2018-04-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/09/2018 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |