CO HB1328 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the "Colorado Loans for Increasing Main Street Business Economic Recovery Act".
Title
Modify Main Street Business Recovery Loan Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1328 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Finance |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |