CO HB1328 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning bed bugs in residential premises, and, in connection therewith, establishing duties for landlords and tenants in addressing the presence of bed bugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord And Tenant Duties Regarding Bed Bugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1328, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1328, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-22 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1328, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1328, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03 Governor Signed
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-24HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-22HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1328
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1328_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1328_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1328_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1328_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1328_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1328_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2415b3f8e90cd0c3872583e40080fff1-hb19-1328-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1328vote5a3cc0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c429cc7956e769ff872583ec00153ed9-hb19-1328-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2415b3f8e90cd0c3872583e40080fff1-hb19-1328-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2415b3f8e90cd0c3872583e40080fff1-hb19-1328-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2415b3f8e90cd0c3872583e40080fff1-hb19-1328-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1328vote5e7859
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1328vote56bf2c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1328vote7e17c7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1328vote7e04ac
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c429cc7956e769ff872583ec00153ed9-hb19-1328-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback