CO HB1327 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-5)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-5)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning former Native American boarding schools in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Native American Boarding Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1327 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1327, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1327 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1327, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1327, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2022-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |