CO HB1327 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the all-payer health claims database, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
All-payer Health Claims Database
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1327 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |