CO HB1324 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to facilitate the use of innovative energy technologies by investor-owned utilities in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, authorizing the public utilities commission to review and approve investor-owned utilities' applications for low-emission innovative energy technologies based on meeting specified criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promote Innovative And Clean Energy Technologies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.022) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1324, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1324, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1324, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1324, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Governor Signed
2021-06-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-24HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-06-07SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-06-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2021-06-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1324
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1324_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1324_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1324_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1324_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1324_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1324_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1324_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1324_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1324_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1324_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1324_L.020.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1324_L.018.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1324_L.014.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1324_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1324_L.022.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1324_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1324_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8e5950daf2139596872586e2006bd7ec-hb21-1324-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1324vote5fc942
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/364e430eec221a7e872586e90073aa7a-hb21-1324-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/364e430eec221a7e872586e90073aa7a-hb21-1324-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1324vote105b3a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1324vote11628c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1324vote5d1369
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1324vote5da24c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1324vote75381e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1324vote754c35
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8e5950daf2139596872586e2006bd7ec-hb21-1324-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8e5950daf2139596872586e2006bd7ec-hb21-1324-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8e5950daf2139596872586e2006bd7ec-hb21-1324-3-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback