CO HB1322 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
concerning injuries resulting from domestic violence.
Title
Domestic Violence Reports By Medical Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1322 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1322, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1322, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1322, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1322 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1322, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1322, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1322, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-20 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |