CO HB1322 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health Coverage Prescription Contraceptives Supply

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Coverage Prescription Contraceptives Supply

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1322 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1322 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1322 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1322 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 31 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 31 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1322, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1322, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2016-04-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2016-04-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-21HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8A7A3F2997F2483887257EF20078F60E?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8A7A3F2997F2483887257EF20078F60E/$FILE/1322_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8A7A3F2997F2483887257EF20078F60E/$FILE/1322phc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8A7A3F2997F2483887257EF20078F60E/$FILE/1322_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8A7A3F2997F2483887257EF20078F60E/$FILE/1322_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0016D1B2B293EB7287257F960076A583
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/EC80B0B018D8076287257F9C00541A52/$FILE/Ap21.pdf#961
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/44F95D6E0A8E53D987257FA00059D3E9/$FILE/Ap25.pdf#1018
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EC176D6B47D76A9287257F960075DF56
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FE42361E160AC86087257F960075D60A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6E3DAA31119916D287257F9600763391
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A4881752B901011387257FAA006830BA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4DF2A7576040FCE487257FAA006856AD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/47EA6A8A85BB68B587257FBC005A3F5C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DDACE72A3B24B5AF87257FBC005A4E32
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0016D1B2B293EB7287257F960076A583
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EC176D6B47D76A9287257F960075DF56
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FE42361E160AC86087257F960075D60A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6E3DAA31119916D287257F9600763391

Bill Comments

feedback