CO HB1321 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning voter transparency requirements to increase information about the fiscal impact of statewide ballot measures that would result in a change in district revenue, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Voter Transparency In Ballot Measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments (Y: 25 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.020) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.015) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1321 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.009) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.006) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments (Y: 25 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.020) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.015) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1321 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.009) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.006) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1321, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-05-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-24 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |