CO HB1320 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning requiring certain health care providers to be accountable to their communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital Community Benefit Accountability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1320 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1320 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment H) to L.004 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1320, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1320, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Governor Signed
2019-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1320
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1320_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1320_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1320_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1320_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1320_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1320_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2dac3e8f4051293d872583e6007de44e-hb19-1320-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e0ab026038905707872583e9004d4c22-hb19-1320-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1320vote5efd4c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/11e23224a799a055872583ec00760881-hb19-1320-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1320vote563505
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2dac3e8f4051293d872583e6007de44e-hb19-1320-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2dac3e8f4051293d872583e6007de44e-hb19-1320-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2dac3e8f4051293d872583e6007de44e-hb19-1320-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback