CO HB1320 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning lowering the age of consent for minors seeking outpatient psychotherapy.
Title
Age Of Consent Outpatient Psychotherapy For Minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1320 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1320 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1320, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1320, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1320 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1320, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1320, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/24/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |