CO HB1314 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a just transition from a coal-based electrical energy economy, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Just Transition From Coal-based Electrical Energy Economy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.018) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.004) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.008) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.007) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.006) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.005) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1314 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.018) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.004) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.008) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.007) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.006) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.005) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1314 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1314, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-18 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2019-04-10 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |