CO HB1312 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the protection of the open internet, and, in connection therewith, disqualifying an internet service provider from receiving high cost support mechanism money or other money received to finance broadband deployment if the internet service provider engages in certain practices that interfere with the open internet and requiring an internet service provider that engages in such practices to refund any such money received.
Title
Open Internet Customer Protections In Colorado
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1312 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1312 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1312, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1312, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1312 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1312, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1312, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |