CO HB1312 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pub Util Commn Elec Transmission Lines Certificate
Title
Pub Util Commn Elec Transmission Lines Certificate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1312 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation to add to the bill to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1312 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation to add to the bill to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1312, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1312, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1312 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation to add to the bill to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1312, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1312, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-04-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-09 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2012-03-06 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-05 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-01 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation |