CO HB1311 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Continue Pharmacy Board
Title
Sunset Continue Pharmacy Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.012 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.012 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.010 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.011 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.010 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.011 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.012 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.012 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.010 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.011 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.010 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.011 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1311, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Second Reading Special Orders - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-04-27 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-04-18 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2012-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-17 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-12 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-10 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-03-08 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment |