CO HB1310 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an application screening fee that a residential landlord charges a prospective tenant.
Title
Residential Landlord Application Screening Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1310, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1310 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1310 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1310, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1310, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1310 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1310 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1310, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1310, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |