CO HB1310 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Div Parks & Wildlife Acquire Real Property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Div Parks & Wildlife Acquire Real Property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1310, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1310 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05HouseGovernor Signed
2015-05-14HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-13HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-04-30HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2015-04-30HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy + Appropriations
2015-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-03-30HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-03-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D68AD9E96B5159E87257DF6006A1DB9?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D68AD9E96B5159E87257DF6006A1DB9/$FILE/1310_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D68AD9E96B5159E87257DF6006A1DB9/$FILE/1310ag_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D68AD9E96B5159E87257DF6006A1DB9/$FILE/1310_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D68AD9E96B5159E87257DF6006A1DB9/$FILE/1310_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D68AD9E96B5159E87257DF6006A1DB9/$FILE/1310sapp_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D68AD9E96B5159E87257DF6006A1DB9/$FILE/1310_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D68AD9E96B5159E87257DF6006A1DB9/$FILE/1310_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3D68AD9E96B5159E87257DF6006A1DB9/$FILE/1310_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/689DAE8FE7AF4C6C87257E180079531B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/26EC070E9612FF4E87257E18007968FA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A19D4A805DE13B1287257E23004B70DB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8AD9F5D4F9C1F41B87257E2F00672F7E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1FD8851ACE6A309787257E31004DAA7F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/060E80B689B8127D87257E31004DA2A4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8AD9F5D4F9C1F41B87257E2F00672F7E

Bill Comments

feedback