CO HB1310 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Proceedings Omnibus Changes
Title
Criminal Proceedings Omnibus Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment L) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment K). A substitute motion was made to adopt prepared amendment L.003. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment M) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment L) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment K). A substitute motion was made to adopt prepared amendment L.003. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment M) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment L) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment K). A substitute motion was made to adopt prepared amendment L.003. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment M) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment L) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment K). A substitute motion was made to adopt prepared amendment L.003. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment M) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-09 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2012-04-24 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-23 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-17 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-10 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-03-08 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |