CO HB1308 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the Colorado agricultural workforce services program in the department of agriculture to provide resources specific to agricultural employment, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Agricultural Workforce Services Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: This is a conceptual amendment L.003 but only lines 1-10 and lines 12-19, striking line 11. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1308, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1308, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1308, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1308, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: This is a conceptual amendment L.003 but only lines 1-10 and lines 12-19, striking line 11. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1308, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1308, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1308, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1308, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-04 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |