CO HB1308 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a clarification under the Colorado open meetings law of the requirements governing communication by electronic mail that do not relate to the substance of public business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonsubstantive Emails And Open Meetings Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-10HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-21HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback