CO HB1307 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to increase access to prescription insulin for persons with diabetes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Insulin Pricing And Access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Reconsideration (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1307 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1307 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1307 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-06-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-27SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
2021-05-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2021-05-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-21HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-19HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1307
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1307_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1307_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1307_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1307_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1307_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1307_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.020.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.029.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1307_L.030.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1307_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1307_hs2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1307_r1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebdaf6f76e2df7b4872586da0082ad79-hb21-1307-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/667e3ff0ed143163872586dc004d4ab1-hb21-1307-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1307vote5abb53
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebdaf6f76e2df7b4872586da0082ad79-hb21-1307-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebdaf6f76e2df7b4872586da0082ad79-hb21-1307-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebdaf6f76e2df7b4872586da0082ad79-hb21-1307-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebdaf6f76e2df7b4872586da0082ad79-hb21-1307-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0414bc6ce0e52671872586e200718bfb-hb21-1307-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1307vote80c119
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1307vote8157b2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1307vote5f3a34
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1307vote601552
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1307vote59c866
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1307vote59dbca
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0414bc6ce0e52671872586e200718bfb-hb21-1307-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback