CO HB1307 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning restricting the availability to children of products that contain dextromethorphan.
Title
Limit Access To Products With Dextromethorphan
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Singer [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1307 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1307 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1307 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1307 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |