CO HB1307 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a family and medical leave insurance program.
Title
Family And Medical Leave Insurance Program Wage Replacement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1307 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1307 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1307 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1307 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1307 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1307, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-19 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-04-11 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |