CO HB1305 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of the income tax credit for corporate crop and livestock contributions.
Title
Crop And Livestock Contribution Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1305, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1305, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1305, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |