CO HB1305 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the authority of tribal entities to administer fingerprint-based criminal history record checks related to emergency child welfare placements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tribal Entity Emergency Child Welfare Criminal History Check

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1305 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1305 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Governor Vetoed
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-11HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1305
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1305_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1305_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1305_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1305_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1305_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1305_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f3a652495dbde9be872583d9005db141-hb19-1305-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1305vote55eb00
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/15da17c6be938a05872583e700071693-hb19-1305-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1305vote670cfe

Bill Comments

feedback