CO HB1305 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Residential Valuation Assessment Ratio
Title
Residential Valuation Assessment Ratio
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1305, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | |
2011-05-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-02 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-04-27 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-26 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |