CO HB1304 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modifications to the affordable housing programs created by the voters' approval of proposition 123.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposition 123 Affordable Housing Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1304, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment H). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment I). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment G). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1304, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment O). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment M). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment L). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05 Governor Signed
2023-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-05-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2023-05-05SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2023-05-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-05-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2023-05-02SenateSenate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-05-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing
2023-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2023-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-04-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb23-1304
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1304_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1304_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1304_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1304_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1304_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1304_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/288265FC277042538725899C004E04C8/HB1304_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/D296AA7ADF25F2BE8725899C005DCDE1/HB1304_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/7E913C206D56D8818725899C005ED221/HB1304_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/B11F2DFB192D33D18725899C006B28E5/HB1304_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/41D533C3B55241F08725899E0007E327/HB1304_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/E13836807601A828872589A3004E956C/HB1304_L.012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/BF0688571A89432F872589A3006FDE70/HB1304_L.013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/1387F691D7C9CCCE872589A4000A8D02/HB1304_L.016.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/0B0692A4029D85C4872589A40006B4F9/HB1304_L.014.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/742BA534B95C5A18872589A5001A0BDF/HB1304_L.019.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1304_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1304_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/49ada2da2b80a91d8725899c00692741-hb23-1304-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1304vote5a0d1a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/89e15353964b8dc6872589a40010da3e-hb23-1304-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/49ada2da2b80a91d8725899c00692741-hb23-1304-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/49ada2da2b80a91d8725899c00692741-hb23-1304-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/49ada2da2b80a91d8725899c00692741-hb23-1304-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/49ada2da2b80a91d8725899c00692741-hb23-1304-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/89e15353964b8dc6872589a40010da3e-hb23-1304-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/89e15353964b8dc6872589a40010da3e-hb23-1304-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/89e15353964b8dc6872589a40010da3e-hb23-1304-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/89e15353964b8dc6872589a40010da3e-hb23-1304-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1304vote75f1d9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1304vote6b248a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1304vote6c0d1f

Bill Comments

feedback