CO HB1304 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment Compensation Benefits Due To Lockout
Title
Unemployment Compensation Benefits Due To Lockout
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1304 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1304 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1304 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1304 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1304 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1304 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1304 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-16 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |