CO HB1302 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Business Training For Judges
Title
Business Training For Judges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1302 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1302 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1302 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1302 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1302 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1302 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1302 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1302 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1302 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1302 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1302 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-05-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs + Local Government | |
2011-05-06 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-03 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-29 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-26 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-04-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |