CO HB1301 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the removal of impediments to cannabis farming, and, in connection therewith, permitting contingency plans to reduce crop loss based on adverse weather and convening a working group to examine measures to reduce cross-pollination, and making an appropriation.
Title
Cannabis Outdoor Cultivation Measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Joint - CC_HB21-1301_2021A: Adopt draft conference committee report CLHB1301.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.014) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1301 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1301 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment H). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Joint - CC_HB21-1301_2021A: Adopt draft conference committee report CLHB1301.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.014) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1301 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1301 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment H). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2021-06-04 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-24 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |