CO HB1301 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning electronic attendance in meetings of school district boards of education.
Title
Electronic Attendance In School District Board Meeting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1301 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1301 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1301 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1301 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-14 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2020-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |