CO HB1299 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning electronic documents related to the ownership of a vehicle that is regulated by the department of revenue, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Filing Title Registration Motor Vehicle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1299 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1299 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1299, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1299, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.009 [Attachment B] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1299, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Governor Signed
2018-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-04-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2018-04-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-24HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-03-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1299
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1299_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1299_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1299_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1299_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1299_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1299_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2018a2018-04-11t133803z-hb18-1299-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2018a2018-04-11t133803z-hb18-1299-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2018a2018-04-11t133803z-hb18-1299-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-23t122228z-hb18-1299-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-23t122228z-hb18-1299-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1299vote5e93c8
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-05-02t134747z-hb18-1299-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-05-03t083717z-hb18-1299-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1299vote60f951

Bill Comments

feedback