CO HB1297 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Analyze Health Data Regarding Front Range Oil Gas
Title
Analyze Health Data Regarding Front Range Oil Gas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI and reverse previous The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.049 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.051 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.053 (Attachment KK) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.048 The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.052 The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend proposed committee amendment L.012 to add the City and County of Broomfield (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment C) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F), as amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI and reverse previous The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.049 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.051 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.053 (Attachment KK) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.048 The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.052 The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend proposed committee amendment L.012 to add the City and County of Broomfield (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment C) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F), as amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1297, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2014-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-01 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |