CO HB1296 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to reduce prescription drug costs, and, in connection therewith, creating the "Colorado Prescription Drug Cost Reduction Act of 2019" to require health insurers, prescription drug manufacturers, pharmacy benefit management firms, and nonprofit organizations to report specified information about the costs of prescription drugs to the commissioner of insurance; to direct the commissioner to analyze the information and submit a report regarding the effects of prescription drug costs on health insurance premiums; to preclude pharmacy benefit management firms from retroactively reducing payments to pharmacies; and to require carriers to reduce consumer cost sharing for prescription drugs to reflect rebates the carrier or pharmacy benefit management firm received.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Cost Reduction Measures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment D) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1296, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1296, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1296, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1296, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
2019-04-11HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance + Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1296
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1296_01.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a0adb91ee3b5aa872583d100717baf-hb19-1296-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e12f739ce9035758872583d90060c6e0-hb19-1296-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e12f739ce9035758872583d90060c6e0-hb19-1296-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e12f739ce9035758872583d90060c6e0-hb19-1296-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a0adb91ee3b5aa872583d100717baf-hb19-1296-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a0adb91ee3b5aa872583d100717baf-hb19-1296-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a0adb91ee3b5aa872583d100717baf-hb19-1296-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a0adb91ee3b5aa872583d100717baf-hb19-1296-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a0adb91ee3b5aa872583d100717baf-hb19-1296-8-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a0adb91ee3b5aa872583d100717baf-hb19-1296-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a0adb91ee3b5aa872583d100717baf-hb19-1296-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a0adb91ee3b5aa872583d100717baf-hb19-1296-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback