CO HB1295 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modifications to the "Colorado Food and Drug Act" to allow products containing industrial hemp, and, in connection therewith, establishing that products containing industrial hemp are not adulterated or misbranded by virtue of containing industrial hemp.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hemp Products Deemed Not Adulterated Or Misbranded

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-04 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Conference Committee on HB18-1295: To adopt the first report of the first conference committee on House Bill 18-1295, that the House accede to Senate amendments made to the bill, as the amendments appear in the rerevised bill with changes. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1295 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1295, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1295, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30 Governor Signed
2018-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-04HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2018-05-02SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2018-05-01 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2018-04-30 First Conference Committee Result was to No Report
2018-04-26SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2018-04-25SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2018-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
2018-04-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1295
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1295_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1295_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1295_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1295_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1295_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1295_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-02t133206z-hb18-1295-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1295vote59cfe2
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-02t133206z-hb18-1295-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-04-19t133152z-hb18-1295-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1295vote578a8b
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1295vote0e5325
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1295vote5e7631
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1295vote69e93f
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1295vote69f67f
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1295vote71cea2
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1295vote71fdba
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/cchb18-12952018a2018-05-01t081332z-hb18-1295-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback