CO HB1295 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Multiple Sclerosis Tax Checkoff
Title
Multiple Sclerosis Tax Checkoff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1295, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations | |
2011-05-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-02 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-29 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-20 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-04-08 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |