CO HB1294 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-10)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-10)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning additional pathways to provide special education services to children with disabilities in charter schools, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Special Education Services In Charter Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (attachment C) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (attachment B) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (attachment C) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (attachment B) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Referred to Appropriations - No Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2022-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-03-24 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |