CO HB1294 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Contraception Coverage Public & Private Insurance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contraception Coverage Public & Private Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1294 indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1294 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1294 indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1294 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. This motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H) (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-11SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2016-03-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2016-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-28HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-03-21HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-03-17HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-02-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A94F29BB65EB88587257F24006451FA?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A94F29BB65EB88587257F24006451FA/$FILE/1294_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A94F29BB65EB88587257F24006451FA/$FILE/1294hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A94F29BB65EB88587257F24006451FA/$FILE/1294_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A94F29BB65EB88587257F24006451FA/$FILE/1294_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/64660B618D74AA2B87257F790080B88C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/090290925EF4CDC687257F85005343BF/$FILE/Ma29.pdf#608
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D4AE89BE0C8546DA87257F79007F2F25
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/39CA1920F5EADE5487257F79007F9646
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6822029671BC6C0E87257F790080240F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DCB7280B02C8669887257F9200720B88
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/74BE1669EB97798387257F9200728B26
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DCB7280B02C8669887257F9200720B88
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/74BE1669EB97798387257F9200728B26

Bill Comments

feedback