CO HB1294 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Law In-state Tuition For Veterans
Title
Federal Law In-state Tuition For Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Rep. Jon Keyser [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Sen. Owen Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1294 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-04-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2015-03-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |