CO HB1294 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Data Privacy Act
Title
Student Data Privacy Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B). Rep murray discussed the amendment. Rep Murray responded to questions from the committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A). Rep. Murray discussed L.006. Rep. Murray responded to questions from the committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. Committee discussion ensued (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C). Committee discussion ensued (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B). Rep murray discussed the amendment. Rep Murray responded to questions from the committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A). Rep. Murray discussed L.006. Rep. Murray responded to questions from the committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. Committee discussion ensued (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C). Committee discussion ensued (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-13 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-02 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2014-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-17 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |