CO HB1293 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the adoption of the 2023 recommendations of the Colorado commission on criminal and juvenile justice regarding felony sentencing, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Felony Sentencing Commission Recommendations
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Soper [R] | Rep. Michael Weissman [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. Julie Gonzales [D] |
Rep. Ryan Armagost [R] | Rep. Iman Jodeh [D] | Rep. Bob Marshall [D] | Rep. Ron Weinberg [R] |
Sen. Kevin Priola [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1293 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1293 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1293, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1293 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1293 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1293, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-24 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance |
2023-04-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |