CO HB1293 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2022 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2022 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the provision of medical records in the custody of a health-care facility.
Title
Medical Record Requests By Attorneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-20 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |