CO HB1293 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the provision of emergency telephone service, and, in connection therewith, establishing the 911 surcharge, and amending the requirements for the emergency telephone charge and the prepaid wireless 911 charge, and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Telephone Service Charges

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1293 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1293, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1293, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1293, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1293, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10 Governor Signed
2020-07-02 Sent to the Governor
2020-07-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-07-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-08SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-03-04HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor + Finance + Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1293
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1293_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1293_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1293_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1293_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1293_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1293_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b0a4d58bae5c185e872585210070b429-hb20-1293-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b0a4d58bae5c185e872585210070b429-hb20-1293-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b0a4d58bae5c185e872585210070b429-hb20-1293-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b0a4d58bae5c185e872585210070b429-hb20-1293-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b0a4d58bae5c185e872585210070b429-hb20-1293-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b0a4d58bae5c185e872585210070b429-hb20-1293-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/08e790af39d6e128872585290055e971-hb20-1293-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/08e790af39d6e128872585290055e971-hb20-1293-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/08e790af39d6e128872585290055e971-hb20-1293-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/180114c4f6a3ff628725857c0062f0bd-hb20-1293-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/180114c4f6a3ff628725857c0062f0bd-hb20-1293-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/180114c4f6a3ff628725857c0062f0bd-hb20-1293-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/180114c4f6a3ff628725857c0062f0bd-hb20-1293-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1293vote04c97f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/07279e38613f5f0a872585820017f21d-hb20-1293-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b028ad93a2c084b787258582006a1075-hb20-1293-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1293vote589cf9

Bill Comments

feedback